Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 365 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18168 Week
» 71184 Month
» 190711 Year
» 3217564 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4157 |
28/12/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08927 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/12/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/12/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4157 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) |
|
|
03/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
04/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
16/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08927 |
|
|
04/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (CH) |
|
|
01/06/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08927 |
|
|