Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4194 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17600 Week
» 70616 Month
» 190143 Year
» 3216996 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4159 |
on |
10/09/1947 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
5101 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
361 |
To Service |
Mon 10/09/1947 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/06/1964 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1947 |
General |
The latest batch of 41XX 2-6-2T have been noted in many places. No. 4148 was seen working local trains between Newport and Cardiff and on station pilot duties at Newport. No. 4157 passed through Cheltenham en route to Tyseley and has since worked stopping trains to Leamington. No. 4159 , also allocated to the Wolverhampton Division (CHR) went via Oxford and was noted there on 12/9. Nos. 4156/8 have joined the 2-6-2T allocated to Severn Tunnel Junction for assisting trains through the tunnel. Recent observations in West Wales found Nos. 3654 an 4654 at Milford Haven, the former on the passenger turn to Johnstone. Nos. 7816, 3447 an 4358, were impressively clean at Neyland. Carmarthen produced a number of the smaller types of loco. Nos. 7407 an 2236 on local goods, 2223 on the 6.15 p.m. departure for Aberystwyth and L.M.S. Nos. 6620 an 6740 on the branch trains to Llandovery. No. 5819, once a regular at Newcastle Emlyn was awaiting repair outside the factory. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/09/1947 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4159 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
30/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
25/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
31/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
31/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neyland (87H) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
15/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4159 |
|
|
10/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|