Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 199 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3231 Week
» 21283 Month
» 254203 Year
» 1919579 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4162 on 20/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 369
To Service Mon 20/09/1948
Withdrawal Mon 11/07/1960
Service Life 11 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 20/09/1948
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 26/12/1953
84E   Tyseley 4w/e 19/04/1958
84D   Leamington 4w/e 01/11/1958
     Withdrawn on 11/07/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/09/1948
1STALLOC THT Treherbert m/e 31/10/1948
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 01/11/1958
WDN   m/e 31/07/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during September included: Nos. 1000/25, 1430/40/61, 1957/91, 2144/81/88/94, 2224/46/71, 2827/38/42/72/77/82, 2948, 3617, 3861/64/66, 3904/55, 4000/37/44/58/88, 4128, 4280, 4407, 4509/32/37/40/50, 4639, 4704, 4804, 4973/75/78, 5011/57/71/79, 5153/56, 5207, 5369/75, 5510/54/74, 5718/33/61, 5903/34/51/62/69/84, 6005/06/12, 6133, 6337/40/75/93, 6406/30, 6801/47, 6905/16/52/70, 7004/05/17, 7306/09, 7402/22, 7800/18, 8722/37/39, 9612, 9730.
New work; September: Nos. 7435 (-), 7436 (OXF), 7437 (WOS), 7438 (DG) (completed 5/10); 4160 (-). 4161 (BRY), 4162 (-), 4163 (BRY) and 4164 (DYD), nearly completed. Works' pilots have been Nos. 212, 1713, 1900 an 2764.
Outside the Works and awaiting scrapping are the following:-Nos. 1730, 2643/80, 2734/46/51, 3002/06/27, 3165/84, 3440, 5127, 5343/49 an 9006. In addition, Nos. 2709, 2928, 3005 an 3395 came in for scrapping at the beginning of October. All locomotives receiving a general repair (except express passenger locomotives) are now coming out painted plain black with the exception of No. 5156, which was fully lined, but without 'British Railways' on the tank sides. The majority of locomotives are now receiving smokebox number-plates.
No. 7017 was ex. Works on 22/9 after light repairs and is now running without nameplates
SLS/194811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/09/1948 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4162
Built at Swindon Works
   
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
19/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
11/07/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 4162    
09/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev