Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 727 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6127 Week
» 24179 Month
» 257099 Year
» 1922475 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4163 on 24/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 369
To Service Tue 24/09/1948
Withdrawal Tue 30/10/1962
Service Life 14 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 24/09/1948
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 03/10/1953
88A   Radyr 4w/e 17/05/1958
82A   Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 21/02/1959
88A   Radyr 4w/e 03/10/1959
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 28/01/1961
     Withdrawn on 30/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/09/1948
1STALLOC BRY Barry m/e 31/10/1948
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 28/01/1961
WDN   on 30/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during September included: Nos. 1000/25, 1430/40/61, 1957/91, 2144/81/88/94, 2224/46/71, 2827/38/42/72/77/82, 2948, 3617, 3861/64/66, 3904/55, 4000/37/44/58/88, 4128, 4280, 4407, 4509/32/37/40/50, 4639, 4704, 4804, 4973/75/78, 5011/57/71/79, 5153/56, 5207, 5369/75, 5510/54/74, 5718/33/61, 5903/34/51/62/69/84, 6005/06/12, 6133, 6337/40/75/93, 6406/30, 6801/47, 6905/16/52/70, 7004/05/17, 7306/09, 7402/22, 7800/18, 8722/37/39, 9612, 9730.
New work; September: Nos. 7435 (-), 7436 (OXF), 7437 (WOS), 7438 (DG) (completed 5/10); 4160 (-). 4161 (BRY), 4162 (-), 4163 (BRY) and 4164 (DYD), nearly completed. Works' pilots have been Nos. 212, 1713, 1900 an 2764.
Outside the Works and awaiting scrapping are the following:-Nos. 1730, 2643/80, 2734/46/51, 3002/06/27, 3165/84, 3440, 5127, 5343/49 an 9006. In addition, Nos. 2709, 2928, 3005 an 3395 came in for scrapping at the beginning of October. All locomotives receiving a general repair (except express passenger locomotives) are now coming out painted plain black with the exception of No. 5156, which was fully lined, but without 'British Railways' on the tank sides. The majority of locomotives are now receiving smokebox number-plates.
No. 7017 was ex. Works on 22/9 after light repairs and is now running without nameplates
SLS/194811
30/06/1958 Bristol Bath Road MPD Standard tanks 82035/6/7/9 have moved here from Radyr June. where they have been replaced by GWR4143/52/60/3/4 which have been displaced at Rhymney by diesel railcars. SLS/195807

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/09/1948 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4163
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
30/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4163    
09/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev