Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2100 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19903 Week
» 72919 Month
» 192446 Year
» 3219299 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
662 |
m/e |
03/1891 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6616 |
m/e |
03/1927 |
British Railways |
46616 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
1P |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3163 |
To Service |
During 03/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 30/09/1955 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1891 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 662 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3163 |
|
|
03/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6616 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Northampton (2C) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46616 |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
09/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
30/09/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46616 |
|
|