Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 129 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 6646 Week
» 6646 Month
» 73508 Year
» 1738884 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 779 m/e 06/1893
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 6663 m/e 02/1928
British Railways 46663 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3390
To Service During 06/1893
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 16/07/1949 off Warrington Dallam (8B)
Service Life 56 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1949

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1893
8B   Warrington Dallam on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn 4w/e 16/07/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 19/07/1947
WDN   w/e 25/06/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1893 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 779
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3390
   
02/1928 Renumbered Renumbered to 6663    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 46663 but not taken up    
06/1949 Scrapped Scrapped    
16/07/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 6663 from Warrington Dallam (8B)    

prev prev