Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2269 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20072 Week
» 73088 Month
» 192615 Year
» 3219468 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2142 |
m/e |
07/1893 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6681 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
46681 |
y/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
1P |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3412 |
To Service |
During 07/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 12/06/1948 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1893 |
7A |
|
Llandudno Junction |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
5A |
|
Crewe North |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
12/06/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1893 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2142 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3412 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6681 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6681 |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 46681 but not taken up |
|
|