Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1786 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19589 Week
» 72605 Month
» 192132 Year
» 3218985 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2144 |
m/e |
07/1893 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6683 |
m/e |
09/1927 |
British Railways |
46683 |
m/e |
11/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
1P |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3414 |
To Service |
During 07/1893 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 28/02/1953 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1893 |
2E |
|
Warwick |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
4A |
|
Bletchley |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
2C |
|
Warwick |
w/e |
14/07/1951 |
2C |
|
Warwick |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
28/02/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
4A |
Bletchley |
w/e |
19/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
2C |
Warwick |
w/e |
14/07/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/02/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1893 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2144 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3414 |
|
|
09/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6683 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Warwick (2E) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (4A) |
|
|
14/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warwick (2C) |
|
|
17/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warwick (2C) |
|
|
11/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46683 |
|
|
28/02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46683 |
|
|
03/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|