Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 388 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18191 Week
» 71207 Month
» 190734 Year
» 3217587 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2218 |
m/e |
09/1893 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6687 |
m/e |
11/1927 |
British Railways |
46687 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
1P |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3420 |
To Service |
During 09/1893 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/12/1949 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 3 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1893 |
7D |
|
Rhyl |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
7B |
|
Bangor |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
7A |
|
Llandudno Junction |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
20/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
7B |
Bangor |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1948 |
North Wales |
Bangor shed received on 6/9 two new Class '2P' 2-6-2T's, Nos. 41212 an 41213 . Both are in the new black livery, lined out in red, straw and grey, the numbers being on the tank sides below the cab window and not on the coal bunker as on the earlier examples of the Class. Both locomotives are fitted for 'push and pull' working, and are to work on the Amlwch and Bethseda branches. No. 41213 made her first trip on the Amlwch branch on 9/9 when she worked the 3.55 p.m. from Bangor. In spite of spending nearly ten minutes at Llangefni disposing of a loaded cattle truck and a large number of parcels and luggage, the arrival at Amlwch was only 6 minutes late. A small crowd of interested railwaymen and others witnessed her departure from Bangor. Until the arrival of these two new 2-6-2T's, traffic on the Amlwch branch has been shared between 2-6-2T No. 1200 and Webb 2-4-2T No. 46687. The latter, although so aged, puts up a good performance on the branch and was noted touching 60 m.p.h. between Gaerwen and Menai Bridge when working the 10.45 a.m. from Amlwch on 9/9. The thrice-weekly goods train on the Holland Arms-Red Wharf Bay branch is worked by either 'Cauliflower' No. 28553 or one of the two tank versions of the Class stationed at Bangor-Nos. 6899 an 6906. Trains from Bangor to Afon Wen are shortly to be worked through to Pwllheli by ex L.M.S. engines and on this account most of the 2-6-4T's at present shedded at Bangor for this duty are to be transferred else-where, since they are not suitable for working over the old Cambrian section of the former G.W.R. They are to be replaced by Stanier 2-6-2T's which will augment the few already there which include Nos. 72 an 124. 2-6-4T's at present shedded at Bangor include Nos. 2258, 2259, 2260, 2261 an 2628. Bangor's rapidly dwindling band of Webb 'coal tanks' include Nos. 7730, 7765 an 7822. Three ex L. & Y. 0-6-0's, Nos. 12119, 12176 an 12407, are also at Bangor for short distance goods haulage. |
SLS/194811 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1893 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2218 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3420 |
|
|
11/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6687 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (7B) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46687 |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46687 |
|
|
1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|