Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 173 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 1264 Week
» 8876 Month
» 75738 Year
» 1741114 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 626 m/e 02/1895
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 6710 m/e 04/1926
British Railways 46710 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3495
To Service During 02/1895
Withdrawal During 09/1949
Service Life 54 yrs , 7 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1949

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1895
8B   Warrington Dallam on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 03/01/1948
5A   Crewe North w/e 05/06/1948
5A   Crewe North 3w/e 11/12/1948
     Withdrawn m/e 09/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 03/01/1948
ALLOC 5A Crewe North w/e 05/06/1948
LOAN 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 28/08/1948
EXLOAN 5A Crewe North w/e 20/11/1948
WDN   w/e 17/09/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1895 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 626
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3495
   
04/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 6710    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B)    
03/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
05/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 46710 but not taken up    
1949 Scrapped Scrapped    
09/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 6710    

prev prev