Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 460 Today
» 1160 Yesterday
» 3785 Week
» 3785 Month
» 70647 Year
» 1736023 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Western Railway 2260 m/e 04/1895
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 6727 m/e 11/1927
British Railways 46727 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class 1P
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Crewe Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3522
To Service During 04/1895
Withdrawal During 12/1952
Service Life 57 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1953

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1895
7D   Rhyl on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10E   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 17/01/1948
4A   Shrewsbury w/e 06/08/1949
10E   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 26/11/1949
8B   Warrington Dallam 4w/e 31/12/1950
11B   Barrow in Furness 4w/e 22/03/1952
11B   Barrow in Furness 4w/e 19/04/1952
     Withdrawn m/e 12/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 7D Rhyl m/e 31/01/1946
LOAN 7D Rhyl 5w/e 02/03/1946
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC 4A Shrewsbury w/e 06/08/1949
LOAN 10D Plodder Lane w/e 12/11/1949
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 26/11/1949
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam m/e 31/12/1950
LOAN 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 19/04/1952
WDN   w/e 03/01/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Crewe Works New Work December: 'IV° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with.
Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque.
SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1895 To Service To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2260
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3522
   
11/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 6727    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rhyl (7D)    
17/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 46727    
06/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A)    
26/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B)    
12/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 46727    
01/1953 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev