Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2022 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19825 Week
» 72841 Month
» 192368 Year
» 3219221 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1383 |
m/e |
04/1897 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6740 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
British Railways |
46740 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
1P |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3758 |
To Service |
During 04/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 08/05/1948 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1948 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1947 |
Carmarthen |
Carmarthen-Llandilo Section (ex L.N.W.R.): No trace now exists of the old L.N.W.R. shed at Carmarthen and the site is much overgrown. Since it was closed the ex L.N.W.R. 2-4-2T's working the branch, have been housed at the G.W.R. shed, but at the week-ended 27/12 only two were allocated: Nos. 6620 an 6740. For some time the L.M.S.R. foot-plate staff have been using G.W.R. locomotives on the branch-usually the 2200 Class or Pannier Tanks from Carmarthen shed, Thus the new era has been somewhat forestalled in this area! Undoubtedly the ex L.N.W.R. locomotives will soon depart from this one-time outpost; it is interesting to recall that before 1912, L.N.W.R. 2-4-2T's had to handle the Salop-Swansea passenger trains! |
SLS/194802 |
31/03/1948 |
Swansea Area |
During Easter L.M.S. No. 6620 (4B) ex L.N.W. 2-4-2T was noted on Pontardulais 'motor' trains prior to its return to Carmarthen: the latter shed (GW) had only L.M.S. No. 6740 for the Llandilo branch but G.W. engines were also being used by L.M.S. men. On Upper Bank shed (ex M.R.) were L.M.S. No. 28543 (4B) (ex L.N.W. 18' 0-6-0), and L.M.S. No. 22907 (2D) (ex M.R. 0-6-0)-both on loan. |
SLS/194805 |
31/05/1948 |
Crewe Works |
New construction for the past month produced only three Caprotti 4-6-0's: No. 44756 (No. 9 of Order E468) completed on 10/5, and No. 44741 and 44742 (Nos. 4 & 5 of Order E.469) completed on 18/5 and 28/5 respectively. Condemned engines cut-up during the past month were dealt with a follows: W/E 8/5 Nos. 7821, 9250; W/E 15/5 Nos. 7769, 9038; W/E 22/5 Nos. 6673, 6738, 9013; W/E 29/5 Nos. 6740, 6920, 25373 an 28484. A number of War Department 2-8-0's of the standard L.M.S. '8F' type have recently returned from the Middle East, and are at present stored in the old carriage works. They are Nos. 70300/01/11/14/18/32/63/94/95/98, 70401/2/3/13/38/43/46/49, 70504/18/76/77/79/82/88 an 70611. Several of these engines are fitted with steam turbo-generators mounted on the right-hand side of the firebox, but no electric lights are in evidence, although conduit piping still exists along the boilers of a few engines. Eight locomotives were recently painted in the new experimental liveries of the British Railways Six Class '7P' 4-6-2's Nos. 46224/27/30/1/2/41 were painted blue (the shade approaching that of Oxford blue), and lined in accordance gwith ex L.N.W.R. practice, whilst two Class '6P' 4-6-0's Nos. 45540 an 46139 were painted green (a shade closely resembling the standard L.N.E.R. green) and also lined in the ex L.N.W.R. style. All eight engines had their buffers, cylinder covers, motion, etc., scoured bright |
SLS/194807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1897 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1383 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3758 |
|
|
04/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6740 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6740 |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 46740 but not taken up |
|
|