Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 4256 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17662 Week
» 70678 Month
» 190205 Year
» 3217058 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1468 |
m/e |
07/1897 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6757 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
British Railways |
46757 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
1P |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3776 |
To Service |
During 07/1897 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1953 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/09/1947 |
Coalport Branch |
For a considerable time ex L.N.W.R. 0-6-2 'Coal' tanks have monopolised the passenger service on this branch, with ex L.N.W.R. 0-6-0 'Cauliflowers' relieving when a 'Coal' tank was not available. However, during the first half of September ex L.N.W.R. 2-4-2T No. 6757 was observed on the branch and this must be considered most unusual as the 'Bank' from Coalport-Madeley Market is 1 in 40 with a stretch of 1 in 31! (6757 is actually a Carmarthen engine and was ex works). |
SLS/194712 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1897 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1468 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3776 |
|
|
12/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6757 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46757 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46757 |
|
|
03/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|