Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1012 |
|
05/1889 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10625 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50625 |
|
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
1 |
Works Number |
5 |
To Service |
During 05/1889 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 09/08/1952 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1889 |
20G |
|
Hellifield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
09/08/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20G |
Hellifield |
w/e |
23/11/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/11/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1889 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1012 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 5 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10625 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hellifield (20G) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50625 |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50625 |
|
|