Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 22 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17825 Week
» 70841 Month
» 190368 Year
» 3217221 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1041 |
|
07/1890 |
Wirral Railway |
6 |
m/e |
06/1921 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
6762 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
46762 |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
4 |
Works Number |
39 |
To Service |
During 07/1890 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/02/1952 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1890 |
10B |
|
Preston |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
16/02/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/02/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/02/1952 |
Wirral Section |
With the withdrawal of 2-4-2T No. 46762 in February, the Wirral locomotive stud has become extinct. Of the 17 engines taken over by the L.M.S., seven were 0-4-4T (all except one being withdrawn in 1923/4), five were 2-4-2T (all purchased second-hand), No. 1 was a 4-4-2 tank (withdrawn 2/24). Nos. 6850/1 were 4-4-4T (withdrawn 1924) and Nos. 6948/9 were 0-6-4T (withdrawn 1924 and 1923 respectively). The only 0-4-4T to receive its L.M.S. number was No. 3, withdrawn in 7/28 as 6776. Of the 2-4-2T, four were Webb 4ft. 6in. tanks, the last in traffic being. No. 6761-withdrawn 7/28. So that the ex- L. & Y. tank outlasted all the other Wirral engines by 24 years. Built at Horwich in July 1890 (works No. 39) as No. 1041, it was sold to the Wirral Company in 1921 and numbered 6, replacing a 0-4-4T; it became L.M.S. 6762 in 4/24 (presumably in error for 10638 which was left vacant for it), and B.R. 46762 in 9/49. It is interesting to note that of the original thirty engines built in 1890/1, thirteen are still on the active list as 50621-3/5/33/4/6/9/40/3/4/6/7, about half a dozen being at Manningham. |
SLS/195205 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1041 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 39 |
|
|
06/1921 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6762 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Preston (10B) |
|
|
03/09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46762 |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46762 |
|
|