Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1814 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19617 Week
» 72633 Month
» 192160 Year
» 3219013 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1046 |
|
08/1890 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10643 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50643 |
|
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
4 |
Works Number |
44 |
To Service |
During 08/1890 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1958 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 1 mth , 30 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1046 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 44 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10643 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barrow in Furness (11B) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50643 |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plodder Lane (10D) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
28/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50643 |
|
|