Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3504 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17547 Week
» 82501 Month
» 285165 Year
» 3312018 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1047 |
|
08/1890 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10644 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50644 |
|
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
4 |
Works Number |
45 |
To Service |
During 08/1890 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/10/1958 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1047 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 45 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10644 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barrow in Furness (11B) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50644 |
|
|
03/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plodder Lane (10D) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
25/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50644 |
|
|