Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 562 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18365 Week
» 71381 Month
» 190908 Year
» 3217761 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1052 |
|
09/1890 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10647 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50647 |
|
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
4 |
Works Number |
50 |
To Service |
During 09/1890 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/02/1959 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
24F |
Fleetwood |
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
EXLOAN |
25A |
Wakefield |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
LOAN |
24F |
Fleetwood |
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
w/e |
22/04/1950 |
LOAN |
26D |
Bury |
w/e |
17/03/1951 |
LOAN |
24B |
Rose Grove |
w/e |
21/04/1951 |
ALLOC |
26D |
Bury |
w/e |
26/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
ALLOC |
26E |
Bacup |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
ALLOC |
26D |
Bury |
4w/e |
30/10/1954 |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/02/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1951 |
Aspinall 2-4-2T |
It will be observed that the engine, No. 50647, one of the earliest Aspinall's 2-4-2 tanks, still retains the original round-top type of firebox. Built at Horwich in September 1890, works No. 50, as L. & Y. No. 1052 (the thirtieth of the class), it was renumbered 10647 in the L.M.S. list after grouping, and became B.R. No. 50647 in August 1949, now stationed at Bury. |
SLS/195111 |
20/07/1958 |
L.Y.R. Locos in steam |
L.Y.R. 2-4-2Ts 50647 an 50850 were noted in steam at Bolton on 20th July. |
SLS/195809 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1052 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 50 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10647 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50647 |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
26/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bacup (26E) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
26/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50647 |
|
|