Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 300 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2001 Week
» 10116 Month
» 137559 Year
» 1802935 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1157   04/1892
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10648   by 1925
British Railways 50648   02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 11
Works Number 151
To Service During 04/1892
Withdrawal w/e Sat 19/11/1955
Service Life 63 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1892
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26C   Bolton w/e 15/09/1951
26C   Bolton 4w/e 06/10/1951
26E   Bacup 8w/e 14/06/1952
26C   Bolton 4w/e 12/07/1952
24B   Rose Grove 4w/e 08/08/1953
27B   Aintree 4w/e 30/01/1954
24B   Rose Grove 4w/e 27/03/1954
     Withdrawn w/e 19/11/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26C Bolton w/e 15/09/1951
LOAN 26E Bacup 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 08/08/1953
LOAN 27B Aintree 4w/e 20/02/1954
WDN   w/e 19/11/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/08/1947 Horwich Works On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1892 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1157
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 151
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10648    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 50648    
15/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bacup (26E)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
19/11/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 50648    

prev prev