Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 137 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17940 Week
» 70956 Month
» 190483 Year
» 3217336 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1159 |
|
05/1892 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10650 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50650 |
|
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
11 |
Works Number |
153 |
To Service |
During 05/1892 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/10/1956 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26E |
Bacup |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
26D |
Bury |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
LOAN |
27B |
Aintree |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
EXLOAN |
26C |
Bolton |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
LOAN |
20C |
Royston |
4w/e |
30/10/1954 |
ALLOC |
20C |
Royston |
4w/e |
25/12/1954 |
ALLOC |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/10/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1159 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 153 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10650 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50650 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bacup (26E) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bacup (26E) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (20C) |
|
|
25/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50650 |
|
|