Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 335 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2036 Week
» 10151 Month
» 137594 Year
» 1802970 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1160   05/1892
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10651   by 1925
British Railways 50651   03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 11
Works Number 154
To Service During 05/1892
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/12/1955
Service Life 63 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1892
26E   Bacup on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26D   Bury 4w/e 24/03/1951
27B   Aintree 4w/e 16/06/1951
26D   Bury 4w/e 11/08/1951
24B   Rose Grove 4w/e 17/05/1952
24B   Rose Grove 8w/e 14/06/1952
     Withdrawn w/e 17/12/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 26D Bury w/e 24/03/1951
LOAN 27B Aintree w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 26D Bury w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 17/05/1952
WDN   w/e 17/12/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1892 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1160
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 154
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10651    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bacup (26E)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 50651    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
17/12/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 50651    

prev prev