Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 315 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2016 Week
» 10131 Month
» 137574 Year
» 1802950 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1164   06/1892
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10655   by 1925
British Railways 50655   02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 11
Works Number 158
To Service During 06/1892
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/08/1956
Service Life 64 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1892
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26D   Bury w/e 09/06/1951
26D   Bury 4w/e 16/06/1951
24B   Rose Grove 4w/e 17/05/1952
24B   Rose Grove 8w/e 14/06/1952
26C   Bolton 4w/e 05/11/1955
24B   Rose Grove 4w/e 25/02/1956
     Withdrawn w/e 11/08/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26D Bury w/e 09/06/1951
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   w/e 11/08/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1892 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1164
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 158
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10655    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 50655    
09/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
11/08/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 50655    

prev prev