Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 644 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14050 Week
» 67066 Month
» 186593 Year
» 3213446 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1065 |
|
06/1892 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10656 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50656 |
|
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
11 |
Works Number |
159 |
To Service |
During 06/1892 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/03/1955 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26E |
Bacup |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
LOAN |
26D |
Bury |
w/e |
24/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
26E |
Bacup |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
24B |
Rose Grove |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
4w/e |
02/10/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/03/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1065 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 159 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10656 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50656 |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bacup (26E) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bacup (26E) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
11/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
12/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50656 |
|
|