Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 332 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2033 Week
» 10148 Month
» 137591 Year
» 1802967 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1168   07/1892
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10660   by 1925
British Railways 50660   01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 11
Works Number 163
To Service During 07/1892
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/03/1958
Service Life 65 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1892
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26E   Bacup 4w/e 04/11/1950
26C   Bolton m/e 30/11/1950
     Withdrawn w/e 29/03/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 23B Aintree 5w/e 02/03/1946
EXLOAN 26C Bolton w/e 18/03/1950
LOAN 26E Bacup w/e 23/09/1950
ALLOC 26C Bolton m/e 30/11/1950
WDN   w/e 29/03/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/08/1947 Horwich Works On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1892 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1168
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 163
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10660    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 50660    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bacup (26E)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
29/03/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 50660    

prev prev