Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1584 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14990 Week
» 68006 Month
» 187533 Year
» 3214386 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1173 |
|
08/1892 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10671 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50671 |
|
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
12 |
Works Number |
174 |
To Service |
During 08/1892 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/03/1952 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1892 |
20F |
|
Skipton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
20E |
|
Manningham |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
20E |
|
Manningham |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
15/03/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20E |
Manningham |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/03/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1173 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 174 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10671 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (20F) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50671 |
|
|
26/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (20E) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (20E) |
|
|
15/03/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50671 |
|
|