Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 586 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5305 Week
» 16450 Month
» 116235 Year
» 1781611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 16   09/1892
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10678   by 1925
British Railways 50678   21/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 12
Works Number 181
To Service During 09/1892
Withdrawal w/e Sat 26/12/1953
Service Life 61 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1892
23C   Southport on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
7D   Rhyl w/e 28/02/1948
10B   Preston w/e 21/10/1950
10B   Preston 4w/e 04/11/1950
     Withdrawn w/e 26/12/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 30/11/1946
LOAN 7D Rhyl w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC 7D Rhyl w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC 10B Preston w/e 21/10/1950
WDN   w/e 26/12/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1892 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 16
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 181
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10678    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
28/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (7D)    
21/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50678    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
26/12/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 50678    

prev prev