Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 641 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5360 Week
» 16505 Month
» 116290 Year
» 1781666 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 46   09/1893
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10687   by 1925
British Railways 50687   07/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 16
Works Number 252
To Service During 09/1893
Withdrawal During 05/1953
Service Life 59 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1893
24D   Lower Darwen 4w/e 22/06/1946
23C   Southport on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
7D   Rhyl w/e 28/02/1948
8A   Edge Hill w/e 03/09/1949
7D   Rhyl w/e 11/02/1950
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 21/10/1950
7D   Rhyl 4w/e 04/11/1950
8B   Warrington Dallam 4w/e 02/12/1950
8B   Warrington Dallam m/e 31/12/1950
     Withdrawn m/e 05/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 7D Rhyl w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC 7D Rhyl w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 03/09/1949
ALLOC 7D Rhyl w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 21/10/1950
LOAN 7D Rhyl w/e 28/10/1950
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam m/e 31/12/1950
WDN   w/e 19/09/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1893 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 46
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 252
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10687    
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
28/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (7D)    
07/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50687    
03/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
11/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (7D)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (7D)    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
05/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 50687    

prev prev