Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3911 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17317 Week
» 70333 Month
» 189860 Year
» 3216713 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
119 |
|
10/1893 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10689 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50689 |
|
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
16 |
Works Number |
255 |
To Service |
During 10/1893 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/08/1952 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20E |
Manningham |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/08/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 119 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 255 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10689 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
29/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (20E) |
|
|
26/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50689 |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50689 |
|
|