Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3953 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17359 Week
» 70375 Month
» 189902 Year
» 3216755 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1210 |
|
11/1893 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10695 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50695 |
|
08/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
16 |
Works Number |
261 |
To Service |
During 11/1893 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/07/1952 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
LOAN |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
ALLOC |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
ALLOC |
10B |
Preston |
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/07/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1210 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 261 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10695 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50695 |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
03/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
18/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50695 |
|
|