Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4283 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17689 Week
» 70705 Month
» 190232 Year
» 3217085 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
36 |
|
02/1895 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10705 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50705 |
|
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
22 |
Works Number |
351 |
To Service |
During 02/1895 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/10/1958 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1895 |
24F |
|
Fleetwood |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
8B |
|
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
25/10/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1948 |
Manchester (London Road)-Lymm-Warrington |
The last of the Webb 'Cauliflower' tanks have now disappeared and their duties taken over by three 2-4-2 ex L. & Y. tanks, Nos. 10697, 10703 an 10705. |
SLS/194808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 36 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 351 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10705 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50705 |
|
|
25/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50705 |
|
|