Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 570 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5289 Week
» 16434 Month
» 116219 Year
» 1781595 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1263   03/1895
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10712   by 1925
British Railways 50712   05/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 22
Works Number 358
To Service During 03/1895
Withdrawal During 03/1959
Service Life 63 yrs, 11 mths , 30 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1895
25D   Mirfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 15/10/1949
25E   Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 04/11/1950
25A   Wakefield w/e 14/04/1951
28A   Blackpool Central w/e 28/04/1951
28A   Blackpool Central 4w/e 19/05/1951
24C   Lostock Hall 8w/e 11/07/1953
27C   Southport 4w/e 09/10/1954
27A   Bank Hall 4w/e 10/08/1957
     Withdrawn m/e 03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 15/10/1949
LOAN 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 07/10/1950
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 14/04/1951
ALLOC 28A Blackpool Central w/e 28/04/1951
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   w/e 28/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1895 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1263
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 358
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10712    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Mirfield (25D)    
05/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50712    
15/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
14/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
28/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 50712    

prev prev