Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2285 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20088 Week
» 73104 Month
» 192631 Year
» 3219484 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1266 |
|
03/1895 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10715 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50715 |
|
26/11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
22 |
Works Number |
361 |
To Service |
During 03/1895 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 05/02/1955 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1266 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 361 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10715 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
21/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
09/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
26/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50715 |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
09/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
25/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
05/02/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50715 |
|
|