Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2477 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15883 Week
» 68899 Month
» 188426 Year
» 3215279 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1272 |
|
05/1895 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10721 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50721 |
|
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
22 |
Works Number |
367 |
To Service |
During 05/1895 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/01/1961 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/08/1959 |
Last few Aspinall 2-4-2T |
Only five Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 2P 2-4-2T locomotives now remain in stock; their shed allocations being as follows: 50850 (26C) Bolton, 50721 (27A) Bank Hall, 50746 an 50781 (27C) Southport, and 50795 (55F) Manningham. Mr. G. E. Jones informs us that a visit to Albert Looms Yard near Spondon on 9/8/59 revealed six condemned examples still intact, namely 50646, 50725, 50777, 50818, 50831 an 50855. In addition to these, the remains of another believed to be 50757, were scattered about the yard. All were condemned during October, 1958, with the exception of 50646 which was withdrawn one month later. |
SLS/195910 |
31/03/1960 |
Aspinall 2P 2-4-2T |
By late March, the position relating to the three Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 2P 2-4-2T locos. remained unchanged, with 50721 (27A) allocated to Bank Hall and 50746 an 50850 (27C) at Southport. |
SLS/196006 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1272 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 367 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10721 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50721 |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (27C) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (27C) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50721 |
|
|