Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 620 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5339 Week
» 16484 Month
» 116269 Year
» 1781645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1272   05/1895
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10721   by 1925
British Railways 50721   08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 22
Works Number 367
To Service During 05/1895
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/01/1961
Service Life 65 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1895
24E   Blackpool Central on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 01/12/1951
27C   Southport 4w/e 01/11/1952
27C   Southport 8w/e 29/11/1952
27A   Bank Hall 4w/e 10/08/1957
     Withdrawn w/e 14/01/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   w/e 14/01/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/08/1959 Last few Aspinall 2-4-2T Only five Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 2P 2-4-2T locomotives now remain in stock; their shed allocations being as follows: 50850 (26C) Bolton, 50721 (27A) Bank Hall, 50746 an 50781 (27C) Southport, and 50795 (55F) Manningham. Mr. G. E. Jones informs us that a visit to Albert Looms Yard near Spondon on 9/8/59 revealed six condemned examples still intact, namely 50646, 50725, 50777, 50818, 50831 an 50855. In addition to these, the remains of another believed to be 50757, were scattered about the yard. All were condemned during October, 1958, with the exception of 50646 which was withdrawn one month later. SLS/195910
31/03/1960 Aspinall 2P 2-4-2T By late March, the position relating to the three Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 2P 2-4-2T locos. remained unchanged, with 50721 (27A) allocated to Bank Hall and 50746 an 50850 (27C) at Southport. SLS/196006

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1895 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1272
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 367
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10721    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blackpool Central (24E)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 50721    
01/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
14/01/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 50721    

prev prev