|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LMS) | Engines running with L.M.S. Numbers. (March 1952) 407, 493, 682, 1324, 1370, 2093, 2994/8, 3062, 3253, 3301/32, 3436, 3514, 3622/62, 3731/49, 3820, 4245, 4436, 6899, 7112/28/29/91, 7377/81, 7407/19/23/96, 7625, 7752, 7822, 8278, 8310, 8510, 8602, 8745, 8921/51, 9010/61, 9108/16/29/99, 9265/70/75/77, 9330/85, 9417, 10725/35, 10807/92, 11537, 12123, 12203/69/93, 16039, 22900/65, 28107/28, 28251, 28312, 28580/3/9. In works: 7597, 4003. Uncertain: 609, 2994 (? done and not advised). | SLS/195206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1896 | To Service | To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 129 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 442 |
||
1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 10735 | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 50735 but not taken up | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Lower Darwen (24D) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) | ||
18/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (25D) | ||
15/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) | ||
06/1952 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 10735 |