Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3994 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13568 Week
» 78522 Month
» 281186 Year
» 3308039 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1316 |
|
06/1896 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10749 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50749 |
|
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
28 |
Works Number |
456 |
To Service |
During 06/1896 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 26/01/1952 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
24F |
Fleetwood |
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
ALLOC |
28A |
Blackpool Central |
w/e |
22/07/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
26/01/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1316 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 456 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10749 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50749 |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
22/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50749 |
|
|