Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 572 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5291 Week
» 16436 Month
» 116221 Year
» 1781597 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1319   07/1896
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10752   by 1925
British Railways 50752   02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 28
Works Number 459
To Service During 07/1896
Withdrawal Mon 12/08/1957
Service Life 61 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1896
23C   Southport on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24E   Blackpool Central w/e 21/08/1948
24F   Fleetwood w/e 31/12/1949
24F   Fleetwood 3w/e 14/01/1950
28A   Blackpool Central w/e 19/08/1950
28A   Blackpool Central 4w/e 09/09/1950
28B   Fleetwood w/e 03/11/1951
25E   Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 06/09/1952
     Withdrawn on 12/08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central w/e 21/08/1948
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 28A Blackpool Central w/e 19/08/1950
ALLOC 28B Fleetwood w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 06/09/1952
WDN   on 12/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1896 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1319
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 459
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10752    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
21/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 50752    
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
19/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
03/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (28B)    
06/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
12/08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 50752    

prev prev