Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2916 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16322 Week
» 69338 Month
» 188865 Year
» 3215718 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1324 |
|
08/1896 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10757 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50757 |
|
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
28 |
Works Number |
464 |
To Service |
During 08/1896 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1958 |
Service Life |
62 yrs , 3 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/03/1959 |
Over and Wharton branch (Badnall Wharf) |
One track of this short branch from Acton Bridge contains the LTS locos. shown as transferred to Spital Bridge (Peterboro') on 6th March 'condemned' in official lists viz. 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81-7/90-3, also ex LNWR 0-8-0s 48945, 49109/13/17/57/80, 49226/330/68. Another LTS loco, is at Badnall Wharf (between Norton Bridge and Standon Bridge) viz. 41936 along with 41078/156/724, 43419/631, 50646/725/57/77/818/31/55/65, 51424/53, 52399/517, 58066/196. |
SLS/195904 |
08/08/1959 |
Last few Aspinall 2-4-2T (Albert Looms Yard) |
Only five Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 2P 2-4-2T locomotives now remain in stock; their shed allocations being as follows: 50850 (26C) Bolton, 50721 (27A) Bank Hall, 50746 an 50781 (27C) Southport, and 50795 (55F) Manningham. Mr. G. E. Jones informs us that a visit to Albert Looms Yard near Spondon on 9/8/59 revealed six condemned examples still intact, namely 50646, 50725, 50777, 50818, 50831 an 50855. In addition to these, the remains of another believed to be 50757, were scattered about the yard. All were condemned during October, 1958, with the exception of 50646 which was withdrawn one month later. |
SLS/195910 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1324 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 464 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10757 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D) |
|
|
25/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50757 |
|
|
02/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
21/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50757 |
|
|