Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 22 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 863 Week
» 14799 Month
» 142242 Year
» 1807618 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1344   03/1897
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10777   by 1925
British Railways 50777   05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 30
Works Number 504
To Service During 03/1897
Withdrawal Fri 03/10/1958
Service Life 61 yrs, 7 mths , 4 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1897
25A   Wakefield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24C   Lostock Hall w/e 15/04/1950
28B   Fleetwood w/e 17/03/1951
28B   Fleetwood 4w/e 24/03/1951
28A   Blackpool Central 4w/e 06/10/1951
27C   Southport 4w/e 17/05/1952
27C   Southport 8w/e 14/06/1952
24C   Lostock Hall 4w/e 24/04/1954
25E   Sowerby Bridge 8w/e 19/06/1954
     Withdrawn on 03/10/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 15/04/1950
ALLOC 28B Fleetwood w/e 17/03/1951
ALLOC 28A Blackpool Central w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 10/07/1954
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   on 03/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/08/1947 Horwich Works On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. SLS/194710
06/03/1959 Over and Wharton branch (Badnall Wharf) One track of this short branch from Acton Bridge contains the LTS locos. shown as transferred to Spital Bridge (Peterboro') on 6th March 'condemned' in official lists viz. 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81-7/90-3, also ex LNWR 0-8-0s 48945, 49109/13/17/57/80, 49226/330/68. Another LTS loco, is at Badnall Wharf (between Norton Bridge and Standon Bridge) viz. 41936 along with 41078/156/724, 43419/631, 50646/725/57/77/818/31/55/65, 51424/53, 52399/517, 58066/196. SLS/195904
08/08/1959 Last few Aspinall 2-4-2T (Albert Looms Yard) Only five Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 2P 2-4-2T locomotives now remain in stock; their shed allocations being as follows: 50850 (26C) Bolton, 50721 (27A) Bank Hall, 50746 an 50781 (27C) Southport, and 50795 (55F) Manningham. Mr. G. E. Jones informs us that a visit to Albert Looms Yard near Spondon on 9/8/59 revealed six condemned examples still intact, namely 50646, 50725, 50777, 50818, 50831 an 50855. In addition to these, the remains of another believed to be 50757, were scattered about the yard. All were condemned during October, 1958, with the exception of 50646 which was withdrawn one month later. SLS/195910

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1897 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1344
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 504
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10777    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
15/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 50777    
17/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (28B)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (28B)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
03/10/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 50777    

prev prev