Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 595 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5314 Week
» 16459 Month
» 116244 Year
» 1781620 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1345   03/1897
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10778   by 1925
British Railways 50778   12/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 30
Works Number 505
To Service During 03/1897
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/03/1953
Service Life 56 yrs , 6 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1897
23C   Southport on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24E   Blackpool Central w/e 26/02/1949
25E   Sowerby Bridge w/e 27/10/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 07/03/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 27/10/1951
WDN   w/e 07/03/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1897 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1345
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 505
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10778    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
26/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
12/11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 50778    
27/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
07/03/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 50778    

prev prev