Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2569 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15975 Week
» 68991 Month
» 188518 Year
» 3215371 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1378 |
|
05/1898 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10795 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50795 |
|
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
34 |
Works Number |
582 |
To Service |
During 05/1898 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/11/1959 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1898 |
20F |
|
Skipton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
20E |
|
Manningham |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20E |
Manningham |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/11/1959 |
WDN |
55F |
Manningham |
on |
16/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/08/1959 |
Last few Aspinall 2-4-2T |
Only five Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 2P 2-4-2T locomotives now remain in stock; their shed allocations being as follows: 50850 (26C) Bolton, 50721 (27A) Bank Hall, 50746 an 50781 (27C) Southport, and 50795 (55F) Manningham. Mr. G. E. Jones informs us that a visit to Albert Looms Yard near Spondon on 9/8/59 revealed six condemned examples still intact, namely 50646, 50725, 50777, 50818, 50831 an 50855. In addition to these, the remains of another believed to be 50757, were scattered about the yard. All were condemned during October, 1958, with the exception of 50646 which was withdrawn one month later. |
SLS/195910 |
16/11/1959 |
Manningham MPD |
The last Aspinall LYR 2-4-2T on the N.E.R., 50795, was withdrawn on 16th November, after being in store for nearly 18 months. |
SLS/196001 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1378 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 582 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10795 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (20F) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (20E) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50795 |
|
|
16/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50795 |
|
|