Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 630 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5349 Week
» 16494 Month
» 116279 Year
» 1781655 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1390   07/1898
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10806   by 1925
British Railways 50806   04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 35
Works Number 594
To Service During 07/1898
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/02/1952
Service Life 53 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1898
25A   Wakefield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25D   Mirfield w/e 21/02/1948
24F   Fleetwood w/e 17/12/1949
24F   Fleetwood 5w/e 24/12/1949
28A   Blackpool Central 4w/e 07/10/1950
27C   Southport w/e 29/09/1951
27C   Southport 4w/e 06/10/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 23/02/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 25D Mirfield w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood w/e 17/12/1949
ALLOC 28A Blackpool Central w/e 07/10/1950
ALLOC 27C Southport w/e 29/09/1951
WDN   w/e 23/02/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1898 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1390
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 594
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10806    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
21/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
04/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50806    
17/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
29/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
23/02/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 50806    

prev prev