Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 53 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5584 Week
» 7322 Month
» 134765 Year
» 1800141 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1391   07/1898
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10807   by 1925
British Railways 50807   04/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 35
Works Number 595
To Service During 07/1898
Withdrawal During 05/1955
Service Life 56 yrs , 10 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1898
26C   Bolton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25F   Low Moor 4w/e 12/07/1952
     Withdrawn m/e 05/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25F Low Moor 4w/e 12/07/1952
WDN   w/e 30/04/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LMS) Engines running with L.M.S. Numbers. (March 1952) 407, 493, 682, 1324, 1370, 2093, 2994/8, 3062, 3253, 3301/32, 3436, 3514, 3622/62, 3731/49, 3820, 4245, 4436, 6899, 7112/28/29/91, 7377/81, 7407/19/23/96, 7625, 7752, 7822, 8278, 8310, 8510, 8602, 8745, 8921/51, 9010/61, 9108/16/29/99, 9265/70/75/77, 9330/85, 9417, 10725/35, 10807/92, 11537, 12123, 12203/69/93, 16039, 22900/65, 28107/28, 28251, 28312, 28580/3/9. In works: 7597, 4003. Uncertain: 609, 2994 (? done and not advised). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1898 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1391
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 595
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10807    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bolton (26C)    
04/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 50807    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
05/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 50807    

prev prev