Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3012 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16418 Week
» 69434 Month
» 188961 Year
» 3215814 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
724 |
|
08/1898 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10815 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50815 |
|
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
35 |
Works Number |
604 |
To Service |
During 08/1898 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1951 |
Service Life |
52 yrs , 6 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1898 |
26C |
|
Bolton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
26C |
|
Bolton |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
02/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
4w/e |
27/04/1946 |
LOAN |
27C |
Southport |
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
EXLOAN |
26C |
Bolton |
w/e |
02/09/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
10/02/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 724 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 604 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10815 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 50815 but not taken up |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bolton (26C) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
02/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 10815 |
|
|