Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1326 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19129 Week
» 72145 Month
» 191672 Year
» 3218525 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
646 |
|
06/1899 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10840 |
|
by 1925 |
British Railways |
50840 |
|
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
38 |
Works Number |
657 |
To Service |
During 06/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/02/1952 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
23C |
Southport |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
24F |
Fleetwood |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
LOAN |
26B |
Agecroft |
w/e |
21/07/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/02/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 646 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 657 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10840 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (23C) |
|
|
02/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50840 |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50840 |
|
|