Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 647 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5366 Week
» 16511 Month
» 116296 Year
» 1781672 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 675   09/1899
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10850   by 1925
British Railways 50850   05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 38
Works Number 669
To Service During 09/1899
Withdrawal During 11/1961
Service Life 62 yrs , 2 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1899
25D   Mirfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24F   Fleetwood w/e 17/12/1949
24F   Fleetwood 5w/e 24/12/1949
26C   Bolton 4w/e 11/08/1951
27C   Southport w/e 13/06/1960
     Withdrawn m/e 11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25D Mirfield 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 25D Mirfield 4w/e 27/04/1946
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood w/e 17/12/1949
ALLOC 26C Bolton w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 27/02/1960
WDN   w/e 28/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/07/1958 L.Y.R. Locos in steam L.Y.R. 2-4-2Ts 50647 an 50850 were noted in steam at Bolton on 20th July. SLS/195809
08/08/1959 Last few Aspinall 2-4-2T Only five Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 2P 2-4-2T locomotives now remain in stock; their shed allocations being as follows: 50850 (26C) Bolton, 50721 (27A) Bank Hall, 50746 an 50781 (27C) Southport, and 50795 (55F) Manningham. Mr. G. E. Jones informs us that a visit to Albert Looms Yard near Spondon on 9/8/59 revealed six condemned examples still intact, namely 50646, 50725, 50777, 50818, 50831 an 50855. In addition to these, the remains of another believed to be 50757, were scattered about the yard. All were condemned during October, 1958, with the exception of 50646 which was withdrawn one month later. SLS/195910
31/03/1960 Aspinall 2P 2-4-2T By late March, the position relating to the three Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 2P 2-4-2T locos. remained unchanged, with 50721 (27A) allocated to Bank Hall and 50746 an 50850 (27C) at Southport. SLS/196006
30/11/1960 Southport MPD Ivatt 2-6-2Ts 41277/328, stored at Buxton since Tutbury branch closure (June, 1960), are in use as station pilots displacing L & Y 2-4-2Ts, 50746/850, which have been placed in store. SLS/196103
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Paint Shop Yard) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201
31/12/1961 Crewe Works (Scrap Road) Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. SLS/196202

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1899 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 675
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 669
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10850    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Mirfield (25D)    
17/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 50850    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
13/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 50850    

prev prev