Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 44 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4763 Week
» 15908 Month
» 115693 Year
» 1781069 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 514   10/1900
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10852   by 1925
British Railways 50852   04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 41
Works Number 711
To Service During 10/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/01/1953
Service Life 52 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1900
25A   Wakefield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24C   Lostock Hall 4w/e 09/09/1950
     Withdrawn w/e 17/01/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 09/09/1950
WDN   w/e 17/01/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Horwich Works 21/04/1948   Unknown Regime    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/04/1948 Horwich Works On 21/4 the following locomotives were in the Erecting Shop: Nos. 133/49, 205, 2701/82/86, 2958, 3841, 4060, 4220, 4307/68, 4497, 4517/48, 5079, 8751/61, 9501/08/20/37, 10630, 10953, 11313/20, 11425, 12089, 12133/71, 12268, 12399, 12411, 12522, 12615 an 12870, while awaiting Works were the following: Nos. 131, 2646, 2796, 2964, 9545, 9607, 10852, 11410, 12152/60, 12397, 12438/67, 12582, 12821/39. Nos. 10429, 10717, 10901, 12247/56, 12422, 12824/37/61 an 12902 were on the scrap road; the boiler of No. 11116 is still there. Nos. R10600 an R10617 are still standing between the Erecting and Paint Shops-the glass having been removed from the coach windows. The only renumbered locomotive seen here with a new cast smoke-box numberplate was No. 45220, the rest not having received them yet. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1900 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 514
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 711
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10852    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50852    
21/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Horwich Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 21/04/1948.    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
17/01/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 50852    

prev prev