Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 43 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4762 Week
» 15907 Month
» 115692 Year
» 1781068 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 525   11/1900
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10855   by 1925
British Railways 50855   06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 41
Works Number 714
To Service During 11/1900
Withdrawal During 09/1958
Service Life 57 yrs , 10 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1900
25F   Low Moor on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
23C   Southport w/e 17/01/1948
26A   Newton Heath w/e 01/04/1950
26C   Bolton 4w/e 24/02/1951
26C   Bolton m/e 28/02/1951
25F   Low Moor 4w/e 08/09/1956
     Withdrawn m/e 09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 01/04/1950
ALLOC 26C Bolton m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 25F Low Moor 4w/e 08/09/1956
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   on 07/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/03/1959 Over and Wharton branch (Badnall Wharf) One track of this short branch from Acton Bridge contains the LTS locos. shown as transferred to Spital Bridge (Peterboro') on 6th March 'condemned' in official lists viz. 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81-7/90-3, also ex LNWR 0-8-0s 48945, 49109/13/17/57/80, 49226/330/68. Another LTS loco, is at Badnall Wharf (between Norton Bridge and Standon Bridge) viz. 41936 along with 41078/156/724, 43419/631, 50646/725/57/77/818/31/55/65, 51424/53, 52399/517, 58066/196. SLS/195904
02/06/1959 Locomotives Sold On 2nd June L. & Y. 50818/31/55/65 were removed from Badnall Wharf to Messrs. A. Looms, Spondon, Derby. On 8th June Compounds 41078 an 41156 and Class 3F 43419 an 43631 were removed to Messrs. Steel and Co. Ltd., Coatbridge Iron Works, Whifflet, Lanarks. SLS/195907
08/08/1959 Last few Aspinall 2-4-2T (Albert Looms Yard) Only five Aspinall ex-L.Y.R. Class 2P 2-4-2T locomotives now remain in stock; their shed allocations being as follows: 50850 (26C) Bolton, 50721 (27A) Bank Hall, 50746 an 50781 (27C) Southport, and 50795 (55F) Manningham. Mr. G. E. Jones informs us that a visit to Albert Looms Yard near Spondon on 9/8/59 revealed six condemned examples still intact, namely 50646, 50725, 50777, 50818, 50831 an 50855. In addition to these, the remains of another believed to be 50757, were scattered about the yard. All were condemned during October, 1958, with the exception of 50646 which was withdrawn one month later. SLS/195910

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1900 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 525
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 714
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10855    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Low Moor (25F)    
17/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
01/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 50855    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
08/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 50855    

prev prev