Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 43 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4762 Week
» 15907 Month
» 115692 Year
» 1781068 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 705   12/1900
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10859   by 1925
British Railways 50859   01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 41
Works Number 719
To Service During 12/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/11/1953
Service Life 52 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1900
26C   Bolton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26A   Newton Heath w/e 22/07/1950
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse 8w/e 14/06/1952
     Withdrawn w/e 28/11/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 22/07/1950
WDN   w/e 28/11/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1900 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 705
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 719
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10859    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bolton (26C)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 50859    
22/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
28/11/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 50859    

prev prev