Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 565 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5284 Week
» 16429 Month
» 116214 Year
» 1781590 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 741   01/1901
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10865   by 1925
British Railways 50865   10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 41
Works Number 726
To Service During 01/1901
Withdrawal Fri 03/10/1958
Service Life 57 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1901
23C   Southport on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26C   Bolton w/e 01/04/1950
25F   Low Moor 4w/e 12/07/1952
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 06/09/1952
     Withdrawn on 03/10/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26D Bury w/e 19/10/1946
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 26C Bolton w/e 01/04/1950
ALLOC 25F Low Moor 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 06/09/1952
WDN   on 03/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/03/1959 Over and Wharton branch (Badnall Wharf) One track of this short branch from Acton Bridge contains the LTS locos. shown as transferred to Spital Bridge (Peterboro') on 6th March 'condemned' in official lists viz. 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81-7/90-3, also ex LNWR 0-8-0s 48945, 49109/13/17/57/80, 49226/330/68. Another LTS loco, is at Badnall Wharf (between Norton Bridge and Standon Bridge) viz. 41936 along with 41078/156/724, 43419/631, 50646/725/57/77/818/31/55/65, 51424/53, 52399/517, 58066/196. SLS/195904
02/06/1959 Locomotives Sold On 2nd June L. & Y. 50818/31/55/65 were removed from Badnall Wharf to Messrs. A. Looms, Spondon, Derby. On 8th June Compounds 41078 an 41156 and Class 3F 43419 an 43631 were removed to Messrs. Steel and Co. Ltd., Coatbridge Iron Works, Whifflet, Lanarks. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1901 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 741
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 726
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10865    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southport (23C)    
01/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 50865    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
06/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
03/10/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 50865    

prev prev